Erasmus, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 73337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Sanderson, Elizabeth Anne (used until: 26 Sep 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 03 May 1999 to 28 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011