Erasmus, Murray John (CPSO#: 57835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 22 Aug 1992
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2003