Erb, Lela Jean Sharpe (CPSO#: 11719)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1947
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Feb 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999