Erdeljan, Petar (CPSO#: 80805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 506
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-3323
Fax: (416) 439-4261
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Petar Erdeljan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Erdeljan ( CPSO# 80805 )

Business Address:
Unit 506
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETAR ERDELJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDELJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009