Erenberg, Yale Abraham (CPSO#: 50510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone: (519) 291-3120 Ext. 6250
Fax: (519) 291-2813
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3125 Ext. 6250
Fax: (519) 291-2813
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrance
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Canada
Phone: (519) 357-3210 Ext. 203
Fax: (519) 357-2931
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

North Wellington Health Care -
Palmerston
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Canada
Phone: (519) 343-2030
Fax: (519) 343-3821
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

N W H C - Louise Marshall Hospital
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
Fax: (519) 323-3741
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

South Grey Bruce Health Centre -
Durham
320 College Street
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 369-2340
Fax: (519) 369-6180
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

S B G H C - Kincardine
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 2Z2
Canada
Phone: (519) 396-3331
Fax: (519) 396-3699
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yale Erenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2006


Corporation Name: Dr. Erenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Erenberg ( CPSO# 50510 )

Business Address:
Wingham & District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Business Address:
North Wellington Health Care
Louise Marshall Hospital Site
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
North Wellington Health Care
Palmerston District Hospital Site
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-2030

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Hospital Centre
Durham Site
320 College Street
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 May 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YALE ABRAHAM ERENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984