Erez, Hanna Jafa (CPSO#: 27966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 206
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-1036
Fax: (905) 820-1500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Erez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNA JAFA EREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EREZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1979