Ergaiey, Houda Ali (CPSO#: 74124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 303
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 745-9889
Fax: (519) 745-6446
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Houda Ergaiey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ergaiey ( CPSO# 74124 )

Business Address:
Belmont Professional Centre
303 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 745-9889

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 09 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOUDA ALI ERGAIEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERGAIEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 18 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2003 to 07 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004