Eriksson, Enid Sindy (CPSO#: 65530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone: (416) 996-3146
Fax: (416) 588-8848
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Enid Eriksson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Eriksson ( CPSO# 65530 )

Business Address:
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 996-3614

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENID SINDY ERIKSSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERIKSSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993