Erlich, Christine Mary (CPSO#: 55455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: Duszewski, Christine Mary (used until: 16 Dec 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 109
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 445-1206
Fax: (416) 445-1235
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Erlich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Erlich ( CPSO# 55455 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
20 Wynford Drive
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 445-1206

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY ERLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERLICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986