Erlich, Murray (CPSO#: 55684)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2586A Yonge Street Toronto ON M4P 2J3
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017