Errett, Lee Edward (CPSO#: 31108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 18, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 3, 2014, St. Michael's Hospital notified the College that Dr. Lee Edward Errett's privileges with respect to aortic valve procedures were voluntarily restricted, effective November 18, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE EDWARD ERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1994