Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Erry, Rajeev (CPSO#: 65306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6D
1450 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Phone: (905) 420-6025
Fax: (905) 837-1099
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEV ERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993