Esadeg, Souad Mohamed (CPSO#: 87638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kitchener Downtown CHC
44 Francis Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 2A2
Phone: (519) 745-4404
Fax: (519) 745-3709
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOUAD MOHAMED ESADEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESADEG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009