Escalaya Advincula, Alejandro Leonardo (CPSO#: 99882)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad San Luis Gonzaga de Ica., 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Feb 2013 to 02 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Feb 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2014