Escallon, Jaime Mainwaring (CPSO#: 43775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of General Surgery
600 University Avenue Suite 1266
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5163
Fax: (416) 586-8847
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
10 EN rm 207
200 Elizbeth St
M5G 2C4
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaime Escallon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Escallon ( CPSO# 43775 )

Business Address:
Suite 1266
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5163

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIME MAINWARING ESCALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESCALLON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 26 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008