Esche, Bernd Arnold (CPSO#: 53200)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernd Esche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Esche ( CPSO# 53200 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017