Esche, Irena (CPSO#: 52997)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Tarvydas, Irena (used until: 03 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Oct 1990