Eshleman, Paul Lawrence (CPSO#: 68319)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Eshleman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014