Eskandar, Khalid Abdulmokatader Abdulkader (CPSO#: 67484)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 18 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000