Eskandar, Mamdoh A A (CPSO#: 71962)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 01 Oct 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 1999