Eskandar, Monira Naguib (CPSO#: 81215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen Street West
unit 1-1
room 126
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33123
Fax: (416) 583-1373
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Eskandar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eskandar ( CPSO# 81215 )

Business Address:
CAMH
U 1-1, Room 126
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIRA NAGUIB ESKANDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESKANDAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jun 2009
Summary:

 On June 17, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eskandar committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that she has engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Eskandar practised medicine in Egypt until she came to 
 Canada in 1991. She received a provisional licence to practise medicine in Newfoundland and 
 Labrador in 2002, and a certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 
 2004. Dr. Eskandar provided information to the Newfoundland Medical Board and the College of 
 Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario which was not accurate, and which created an impression that 
 she had been in continuous medical practice since receiving her Egyptian medical licence, when in 
 fact she ceased continuous medical practice after she came to Canada in 1991.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  Dr. Eskandar successfully complete, at her own expense, 
 the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, and in any 
 event within six months of the date of the Order, and to provide proof thereof to the College.

2. 
  Dr. Eskandar appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.  Dr. Eskandar pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650, within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4.  The results of this 
 proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 17, 2009