Esmaeli-Azad, Bita (CPSO#: 69622)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Finch University of Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1996