Esmail, Tariq (CPSO#: 107061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 289 834 3211
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Tariq Esmail shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical  education  program  in  which  Dr.  Esmail  is  enrolled  at the
                  University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Esmail's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Esmail  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching  unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where  Dr.  Esmail  is  properly   practising   medicine   and  to  which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr. Esmail's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program,
                  Dr. Esmail shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Esmail may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent of
                  his employment  at  Lakeridge  Health  Corporation  Oshawa,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In  Dr.  Esmail's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Esmail may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate  of  registration expires, and Dr. Esmail must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Esmail is  no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Esmail no longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid employment authorization under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Esmail must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education program  if  any  one  of  the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the  supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns  regarding  Dr.  Esmail's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Esmail's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Esmail  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Esmail's employment as specified in paragraph (4)  ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr.  Esmail  takes  a leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Esmail may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Esmail  applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  November 1, 2017.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate of  registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.