Esmond, Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 32373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone: (613) 739-8388
Fax: (613) 731-2248
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E.M. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Esmond ( CPSO# 32373 )

Business Address:
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone Number: (613) 739-8388

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARY ESMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1981