Esmond, John Edward (CPSO#: 68057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 273-3636
Fax: (905) 273-9881
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John E. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Adamo Grand Park Medical Suite 208 719 Central Parkway West Mississauga, Ontario L5B 4L1 Tel: (905) 270-3636 Fax: (905) 270-8881
Date Received: 13 Mar 2012

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., December 18, 2015, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. John Edward Esmond:

            (a)   Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                  prescriptions for any of the following substances:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
                        and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule
                        "C").
                  
            (b)   Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his
                  office(s) in the form set out at Schedule "D".  For further clarity, this
                  sign shall state as follows: 

                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
            Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following: 

                  *     Narcotic Drugs
                  *     Narcotic Preparations
                  *     Controlled Drugs
                  *     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                  *     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish.
                  
            (c)   Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the
                  purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
                  Order and will make his Ontario Health Insurance Plan billings and
                  Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College for this
                  purpose.

            (d)   Dr.  Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first
                  available Professional Boundaries and Ethics ("ProBE") Canada course and
                  University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses
                  are unavailable, other courses acceptable to the College in ethics,
                  boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four (4) months of the
                  date of this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Dec 2015
Summary:

On December 18, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Esmond committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and he 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. Dr. Esmond admitted to the allegations. 
 
On July 31, 2013, the College received a letter from the Office of the Chief Coroner notifying the College 
of the death of a patient of Dr. Esmond. The Coroner raised concerns with respect to the care provided by 
 Dr. Esmond, including the dose of morphine prescribed prior to the patient’s death. This information led 
 the College to initiate an investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice. 
  
 The College retained a Medical Inspector, Dr. X as part of its investigation. Dr. X found that Dr. Esmond 
 failed to meet the standard of practice in the care provided to 16 of the 36 patients whose charts were 
 reviewed and one of seven patient encounters observed in Dr. Esmond’s office. Further, Dr. Esmond’s 
 care exposed patients to risk of harm by “placing [them] in a situation of reliance on major analgesics for 
 an undefined and indeterminate length of time.” 
   
 On May 20, 2014, after receiving Dr. X’s report, Dr. Esmond voluntarily entered into an undertaking 
 relinquishing his privileges to prescribe narcotics, benzodiazepines and all other monitored drugs and 
 controlled substances. Dr. Esmond also undertook to refer all patients on opioid therapy to other 
 physicians for assessment and care. On February 12, 2015, following the referral of this matter to the 
 Discipline Committee, Dr. Esmond signed an interim undertaking imposing substantially similar 
 restrictions on his certificate of registration pending the hearing.  
  
 In addition, Dr. Esmond treated a family member between 2007 and 2014, acting as the family member’s 
 primary care provider between 2007 and 2011, and following the family member for a number of serious 
 medical conditions. In the course of treating his family member, Dr. Esmond made diagnoses, ordered 
 investigations, made referrals to specialists, wrote prescriptions, including prescriptions for psychotropic 
 medication, billed the Ontario Health Insurance Program (“OHIP”), and completed insurance forms. 
 Some of Dr. Esmond’s treatment of his family member was not documented in his records or billed to 
 OHIP. By treating his family member in this manner over the course of many years, Dr. Esmond acted in 
 direct contravention of the College’s Policy on Treating Self and Family Members.  
  
 A second investigation into Dr. Esmond’s practice was commenced after the College received a third-
 party complaint alleging that Dr. Esmond had entered into a relationship with a physician whom he was a 
 supervising, Dr. A, between February 2009 and March 2011. Dr. Esmond and Dr. A subsequently 
 developed a personal and intimate relationship. 
  
 While acting as her supervisor, Dr. Esmond sought and received medical treatment from Dr. A on 
 approximately 40 occasions for various conditions, including a burn to his hand and chronic back pain. In 
 addition, Dr. A referred Dr. Esmond to a chiropractor, urologist, psychiatrist, nephrologist and a Physical 
 Medicine specialist as well as prescribed various medications to him, completed a disability form for him, 
 ordered a CT scan of his lumbar spine and ordered an MRI scan of his thoracic spine. Dr. Esmond 
 continued to seek intermittent treatment from Dr. A following the conclusion of the period of supervision. 
 In addition, after the conclusion of the period of supervision, Dr. A completed an insurance assessment 
 for Dr. Esmond which was submitted to his insurance company in support of his application for disability 
 benefits.   
  
 Dr. Esmond also treated Dr. A during the period of supervision. Dr. Esmond continued to provide 
 incidental treatment to Dr. A on occasion following the conclusion of the period of supervision, including 
 ordering an ultrasound for Dr. A and referring Dr. A to a gynaecologist.  
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  the Registrar suspend Dr. Esmond’s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months 
      commencing immediately. 
  -  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Esmond’s certificate 
     of registration: 
     (a)  Dr. Esmond shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the 
           following substances: 
            (i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
            (ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
            (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs 
                Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);  
            (iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines 
                and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
                Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);  
                (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
                Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule “A”; and 
                the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule “B”) 
            (v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness 
                Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C” [to the Order]). 
      (b)   Dr. Esmond shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in the form 
            set out at Schedule “D” [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:  
                  IMPORTANT NOTICE 
                   
                  Dr. Esmond must not prescribe any of the following:  
                    -  Narcotic Drugs 
                    -  Narcotic Preparations 
                    -  Controlled Drugs 
                    -  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 
                    -  All other Monitored Drugs 
                   
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
                  Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 
             
            A sign reflecting this restriction will also be posted in Spanish. 
      (c)   Dr. Esmond shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
            charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and 
            enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order and will make his Ontario Health 
            Insurance Plan billings and Narcotics Monitoring System data accessible to the College 
            for this purpose. 
      (d)   Dr.  Esmond must successfully complete, at his own expense, the first available 
            Professional Boundaries and Ethics (“ProBE”) Canada course and University of Toronto 
            Medical Record Keeping course, or, if these courses are unavailable, other courses 
            acceptable to the College in ethics, boundaries, and medical record keeping, within four 
            (4) months of the date of this Order. 
   - Dr. Esmond appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   - Dr. Esmond pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 30 days of the date of this 
     Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): December 18, 2015