Esperanzate, Patrick Wayne Bautista (CPSO#: 85711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
145 Station Street, Unit 200
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 771-3396
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK WAYNE BAUTISTA ESPERANZATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESPERANZATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009