Espiritu, Froilan Natividad (CPSO#: 60567)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Manila Central University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain their medical records can submit their request to: froilan.espiritu@icloud.com.
Date Received: 02 Jan 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2015

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: April 6, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Froilan Espiritu has resigned from the College.