Esposito, John Guido (CPSO#: 104570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GUIDO ESPOSITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESPOSITO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2017 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017