Esquivel, Manuel Novelo (CPSO#: 54543)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Suite 205 474 College Street Toronto Ontario M6G 1A4 Tel: (416) 961-8186
Date Received: 24 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013