Esser, David Earl (CPSO#: 58227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8133
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Esser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Esser ( CPSO# 58227 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8133

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4L9
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID EARL ESSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988