Esses, Stephen Ivor (CPSO#: 50514)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Sep 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1994

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 1992
Summary:

 In February 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Esses guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 
 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Esses be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further ruled that Dr. Esses be fined the 
 sum of $5000.00.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Feb 1992