Estey, Andrea Kathleen (CPSO#: 84366)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012