Esufali, Susmita (CPSO#: 98672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Center
6633 Highway 7 East, Suite 214
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Amica at Unionville
34 Main Street
Unionville, Ontario
Markham ON  L3R 4Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-947-9990
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Union Villa Long-Term Care
4300 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 1L8
Canada
Phone: 905-477-2839
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSMITA ESUFALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESUFALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015