Eteer, Mustafa Salim (CPSO#: 57819)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Garyounis University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995