Etemad-Rezai, Roya (CPSO#: 70024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, German

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
LHSC - University Hospital
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32894
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roya Etemad-Rezai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Etemad-Rezai ( CPSO# 70024 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Med
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROYA ETEMAD-REZAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETEMAD-REZAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004