Ettler, Helen Catrin (CPSO#: 66988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36376
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suskin and Ettler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suskin ( CPSO# 64624 )
Dr. H. Ettler ( CPSO# 66988 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6-124G - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN CATRIN ETTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETTLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1993