Etzkorn, William George (CPSO#: 50516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chin Building
Suite 303
622 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B4
Phone: (416) 534-1143
Fax: (416) 534-6131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William G. Etzkorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Etzkorn ( CPSO# 50516 )

Business Address:
Chin Building
Suite 303
622 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1B4
Phone Number: (416) 534-1143

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GEORGE ETZKORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETZKORN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 1986
Summary:

 In November 1986, Dr. Etzkorn pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(16) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he falsified records in respect of the 
 examination or treatment of his patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found 
 Dr. Etzkorn guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Etzkorn's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that the imposition 
 of that penalty would itself be suspended indefinitely upon the condition that the Doctor pay a 
 fine of $2000.00.  In addition, the Committee ruled that Dr. Etzkorn be reprimanded, and that the 
 fact of the reprimand be recorded on the College Register.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 27 Nov 1986