Eugenio, Arthur Manuel (CPSO#: 80806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Ext. 2200
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arthur Eugenio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Eugenio ( CPSO# 80806 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR MANUEL EUGENIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUGENIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006