Eusebio-Torres, Engracia De Ocampo (CPSO#: 42399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENGRACIA DE OCAMPO EUSEBIO-TORRES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUSEBIO-TORRES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1985