Eustace, Nicholas Peter (CPSO#: 82137)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005