Evans, Andrew John (CPSO#: 69109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton 11 444
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3833
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000