Evans, David Charles (CPSO#: 66334)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2006