Evans, David Kenneth (CPSO#: 96121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Cundles Rd E
Suite 203
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 728-4242
Fax: 705-728-5703
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. W.
Department of Emergency Medicine
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: 705-325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Kenneth Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Evans ( CPSO# 96121 )

Business Address:
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y8
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
203 - 190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 728-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013