Evans, Devon Christopher Rasmussen (CPSO#: 113586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  07 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 11 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVON CHRISTOPHER RASMUSSEN EVANS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EVANS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. EVANS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EVANS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. EVANS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. EVANS is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. EVANS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 07 Mar 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2017 to 20 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 11 Jan 2018 to 07 Feb 2018
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2018 to 07 Mar 2018
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Mar 2018