Evans, Edward Morgan (CPSO#: 67243)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 1998 to 31 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005