Evans, Gerald Anthony (CPSO#: 50517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3013 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6619
Fax: (613) 533-6825
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald A. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Evans ( CPSO# 50517 )

Business Address:
Room 3013 Etherington Hall
Queens University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6619

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD ANTHONY EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984