Evans, Holly Christine Lockhart (CPSO#: 68842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Holly Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Evans ( CPSO# 68842 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLLY CHRISTINE LOCKHART EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000