Evans, Jane Browning (CPSO#: 54146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
458 MacLaren Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone: (613) 230-0586
Fax: (613) 230-9204
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane B. Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Evans ( CPSO# 54146 )

Business Address:
458 MacLaren Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone Number: (613) 230-0586

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE BROWNING EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985