Evans, Jennifer Beatrice (CPSO#: 62171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4319 Cove Road
Box 58
Portland ON  K0G 1V0
Phone: (613) 272-3302
Fax: (613) 272-3024
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER BEATRICE EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1992