Evans, John Tate (CPSO#: 86181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: (226) 440-3440
Fax: (226) 440-3544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Tate Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Evans ( CPSO# 86181 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (226) 440-3440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TATE EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012